Financial history WELLINGTON MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity number: 801321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.24k £668 £19.69k £2.95k £4.68k
Total expenditure £3.82k £2.51k £1.69k £2.54k £3.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.91k N/A N/A