Accounts and annual returns THE JACK KING CHARITY

Charity number: 801328
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 March 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 February 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 05 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required