SPAYWATCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spaywatch is no longer active, and is in the process of winding down according to the Charity Commission's terms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 April 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald Norden | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HODSON | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Daisy Scullion | Trustee | 14 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/03/2017 | 18/03/2018 | 18/03/2019 | 18/03/2020 | 18/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.23k | £5.98k | £12.44k | £15.44k | £14.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.10k | £31.50k | £31.34k | £26.50k | £12.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Annual return | 18 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days | |
Annual return | 18 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 861 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 861 days | |
Annual return | 18 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 March 2020 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH MARCH 1989 as amended on 12 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS IN DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF A SPAYING SERVICE.(II) TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF ANIMAL CHARITIES AND THE CHARITABLE WORK OF OTHER ANIMAL WELFARE GROUPS PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOT MORE THAN A QUARTER OF THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE EXPENDED IN THIS WAY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 Station Road
Fulbourn
CAMBRIDGE
Cambridgeshire
Cambridgeshire
CB21 5ES
- Phone:
- 01733370198
- Email:
- SPAY.WATCH@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window