Financial history KING'S CROSS KOREAN CHURCH

Charity Number: 801352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £111.58k £134.15k £101.39k £96.62k £116.22k
Total expenditure £110.30k £117.25k £93.44k £115.53k £124.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A