CLACTON AND NORTH EAST ESSEX ARTS AND LITERARY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in an appreciation of Science and the Arts, including literature, music and drama. To attract high calibre presentations in the pursuit of excellence as in the Society?s motto ?Praestantiam petimus?. It is also the Trustees? policy to ensure that the presentations are affordable to prospective members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 13 April 1989: Standard registration
- CLACTON ARTS & LITS (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vera Horley | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Day | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Stephens | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
John Stephen Snow | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lois Schatten | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Weston | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Zabeth Spencer Gilbert | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/03/2020 | 04/03/2021 | 07/03/2022 | 15/03/2023 | 15/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.84k | £5.00k | £55.21k | £59.16k | £55.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.23k | £6.98k | £71.14k | £70.71k | £69.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 March 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 March 2022 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 March 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 445 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH MARCH 1989 as amended on 28 Mar 2022 as amended on 28 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AN APPRECIATION OF SCIENCE AND THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF LITERATURE, MUSIC AND DRAMA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Skelmersdale Road
CLACTON-ON-SEA
Essex
CO15 6DE
- Phone:
- 01255429287
- Email:
- anne.caneeaal@g.mail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window