THE NATIONAL CHILDBIRTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer information and support in pregnancy, childbirth and early parenthood We aim to give every parent the chance to make informed choices We want to make sure that everyone in the UK, regardless of background or location, has access to our services and activities We advocate on behalf of parents to make the UK more parent friendly by improving services and support for parents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£11,848,572
Donations and legacies | £838.11k | |
Charitable activities | £10.48m | |
Other trading activities | £407.85k | |
Investments | £96.70k | |
Other | £26.63k |
Total expenditure:
£12,064,573
Raising funds | £135.21k | |
Charitable activities | £11.15m | |
Other | £779.57k |
£230,120 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £611,280 from 5 government contract(s) and £228,352 from 18 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £914.78k | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.15m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £914.78k | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.15m | |
Retained for future use | £14.12k |
People

187 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
3251 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 April 1989: Standard registration
- 10 July 2013: Funds received from 1110358 THE BABY CAFE CHARITABLE TRUST
- 04 June 2015: Funds received from 295346 MIDWIVES INFORMATION AND RESOURCE SERVICE
- 30 October 2019: Funds received from 1172175 BENEFIT BREASTFEEDING
- 24 June 2020: Funds received from 1057609 ST MARK'S PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
- N C T (Working name)
- NCT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joelle Warren | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vikram Sundarraj | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mikayla Pencross | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julien Haye | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Austen Richardson | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ema Ojiako | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Franciane Husbands-Chevot | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sherida Bevan | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Sharon Lambe | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Brown | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|||||
David James Shanks | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.35m | £10.41m | £10.86m | £11.25m | £11.85m | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.47m | £10.35m | £10.61m | £11.66m | £12.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £487.00k | £561.00k | £530.00k | £796.00k | £611.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £617.00k | £396.00k | £432.00k | £228.35k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.40m | £1.51m | £1.07m | £958.00k | £838.11k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.14m | £308.00k | £414.00k | £515.00k | £407.85k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.53m | £8.48m | £9.25m | £9.65m | £10.48m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £155.00k | £77.00k | £84.00k | £93.00k | £96.70k | |
|
Income - Other | £120.00k | £37.00k | £48.00k | £37.00k | £26.63k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £14.85m | £9.38m | £9.73m | £10.70m | £11.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.49m | £478.00k | £210.00k | £239.00k | £135.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £41.00k | £34.00k | £51.00k | £10.00k | £26.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £17.00k | £26.00k | £26.00k | £26.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £120.00k | £495.00k | £676.00k | £718.00k | £779.57k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.41m | £1.34m | £1.30m | £1.27m | £1.24m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.98m | £3.43m | £3.79m | £3.71m | £4.00m | |
|
Other assets | £2.69m | £2.93m | £3.71m | £3.32m | £2.42m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.94m | £3.11m | £3.66m | £3.71m | £3.06m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/04/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2015 as amended on 13 Oct 2018 as amended on 08 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF PREGNANT WOMEN BY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT DURING PREGNANCY AND CHILDBIRTH; 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN DURING THE POST-NATAL PERIOD; AND 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN CHILDBIRTH AND PARENTHOOD.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
NCT
27 Old Gloucester Street
LONDON
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 02087522454
- Email:
- enquiries@nct.org.uk
- Website:
-
nct.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window