Financial history BROAD OAK VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 801396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £14.85k £10.95k £10.86k £8.17k £10.46k
Total expenditure £15.44k £7.43k £8.10k £12.58k £11.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £8.00k £2.67k N/A N/A