BROAD OAK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the inhabitants of Broad Oak, in the Parish of Sturry, in the County of Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 18 April 1989: Standard registration
- BROAD OAK HALL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Murray | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN WARNER | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Kirkham | Trustee | 07 December 2010 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marchant | Trustee | 07 December 2010 |
|
|
||||
MR GRAHAM KENMIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ROB COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER JANE STENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.85k | £10.95k | £10.86k | £8.17k | £10.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.44k | £7.43k | £8.10k | £12.58k | £11.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £8.00k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16/08/1983 AS AMENDED ON 09/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BROAD OAK, IN THE PARISH OF STURRY, IN THE COUNTY OF KENT FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
VILAGE OF BROAD OAK
Contact information
- Address:
-
120 Sweechgate
Broad Oak
Canterbury
CT2 0QP
- Phone:
- 01227639259
- Email:
- susanmarchant@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window