THE HERSDEN NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities, services, and support to all members of the community of Hersden. To manage the Community Centre for the benefit of all members of the community in Hersden. Services provided include Holiday Playschemes, Senior Citizens Lunch Club, Art Group and Coffee Mornings. We host various statutory and grant funded agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 19 April 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREA BRABHAM | Chair | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Campbell | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hatton | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jourdan Sparrow | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Giles | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Hougham | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ross Llewellyn | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELSIE EDWARDS | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Glover | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.12k | £44.05k | £44.05k | £43.09k | £42.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.55k | £43.32k | £43.32k | £45.33k | £62.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2021 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2021 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH OCTOBER 1988, AS AMENDED 30TH JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HERSDEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME
Area of benefit
HERSDEN VILLAGE AND IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hersden Neighbourhood Centre
The Avenue
Hersden
CANTERBURY
CT3 4HL
- Phone:
- 01227712040
- Email:
- info@hnca.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window