MRS Independent Living

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in North East London, we support people in need to stay independent, active and connected to their communities. We provide practical help through our home adaptations and therapeutic decluttering services, social and digital inclusion activities, falls prevention services, and advice and advocacy for people from marginalised and excluded communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £65,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £19,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Hackney
- Islington
Governance
- 08 June 1989: Standard registration
- THE MOBILE REPAIR SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Takumba Maria Lawal | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle Cornes | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Tunks | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Oyetade Oyebode | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Des Hardiman | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr John Miles | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JANE TILSTON BSC MSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
STEPHEN STEPPENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
REBECCA HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.33k | £225.55k | £300.90k | £335.07k | £419.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.64k | £262.91k | £286.15k | £307.98k | £404.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £60.00k | £65.00k | £65.00k | £95.00k | £65.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.82k | £37.53k | N/A | £19.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH DECEMBER 1986 as amended on 22 Oct 2020 as amended on 08 Oct 2020 as amended on 05 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
The relief of those in need by reason of age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage in the London Boroughs of Islington, Hackney, City of London and other boroughs, through the provision of services and products to promote independence, health and wellbeing and social inclusion.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY AND ISLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
329 Queensbridge Road
LONDON
E8 3LA
- Phone:
- 03303801013
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window