THE CHRIS BRASHER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for the recreation of people of the UK, with particular focus on those with special needs by focus by reason of their youth, poverty or social and economic circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 April 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHIRLEY JULIET BRASHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Brasher | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
HUGH BRASHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.93k | £9.03k | £8.45k | £9.35k | £12.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.24k | £6.24k | £276 | £6.26k | £241 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED THE 31ST MARCH 1988 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (PARTICULARLY FACILITIES IN THE WILD AREAS OF THESE ISLANDS) FOR THE RECREATION OF THE PEOPLE OF THE UNITED KINGDON WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS UPON THOSE WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO CONSERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WILD AREAS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN THEIR NATURAL CONDITION SO AS TO LEAVE THEM UNIMPAIRED FOR FUTURE ENJOYMENT AND STUDY IN SUCH A MANNER THE THE NEEDS AND ASPIRATIONS OF THE INDIGENOUS POPLUATION ARE ACKNOWLEDGED AND RESPECTED. THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 HOWARDS LANE
LONDON
SW15 6NY
- Phone:
- 02088913771
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window