Accounts and annual returns THE KING'S CHURCH (RINGWOOD)

Charity Number: 801431
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 March 2023 36 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On Time