Financial history THE KING'S CHURCH (RINGWOOD)

Charity Number: 801431
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £53.90k £53.38k £68.44k £56.99k £54.59k
Total expenditure £40.53k £51.66k £60.26k £48.14k £53.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A