CALL SOUTH WEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide communication aids for children and adults who have lost the facility of speech. On average we help 6 individuals per year by purchasing equipment. We raise money ourselves by fundraising in the community as well as receiving charitable donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 11 May 1989: Standard registration
- CALL SW (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Parker | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Tremain | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
DR MR GEOFFREY PERHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE GILLIAN MAKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN SAGER MAKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRISH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | £634 | £5.40k | £1.32k | £4.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.43k | £6.49k | £1.52k | £4.44k | £7.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS DISABLED IN THE FACULTIES OF SPEECH BY SUCH CHARITABLE METHODS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE DECLARATION OF TRUST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
103 Fore Street
Plympton
Plymouth
PL7 1ND
- Phone:
- 01752337572
- Email:
- chris@johnandchris.plus.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window