THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF WYKE CHAMPFLOWER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities Environment/Conservation/Heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 28 April 1989: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF WYKE CHAMPFLOWER (Working name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Poppy Tuke | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER THOMAS CLOTHIER | Trustee | 21 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN CLOTHIER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.02k | £1 | £52 | £14 | £740 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.67k | £8.67k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 24TH APRIL 1989
Charitable objects
PRESERVATION, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC AND CURTILAGE OF HOLY TRINITY CHURCH, WYKE CHAMPFLOWER, ITS ORGAN AND BELL, AND PROVIDING SUCH FURNITURE AND FITTINGS AND STRUCTURES BOTH INTERIOR, EXTERIOR AND IN THE CURTILAGE AS MAY BE CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE BY THE COMMITTEE OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH AND CURTILAGE, WYKE CHAMPFLOWER, SOMERSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL HOUSE FARM
WYKE CHAMPFLOWER
BRUTON
BA10 0PR
- Phone:
- 01749812274
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window