Trustees DORSET FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 801504

Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mervyn Roy Goddard | Chair | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA LONG | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARY PARKER-HARRIS | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ADAMS | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY ANNE ROBINSON | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA TANNER | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE SQUIRES | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHERRY DIANE FISHER | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE WINTER | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET CHUCK | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUNE MARGARET TAYLOR | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ROY YATES | Trustee | 05 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.