Trustees THE BARRY AND PEGGY HIGH FOUNDATION
Charity number: 801518

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTONY HOW | Chair | 15 February 2005 |
|
|
||||
Philip Roger Hugo Trim | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Jonathan Francis Wortley | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Preston | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Richard Holmes | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Taylor-Brown | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.