1ST WOOSEHILL SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wokingham
Governance
- 11 July 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jane Hopkins | Chair | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Keith Jordan | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
William John Anthony Queenan | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Lucille Overd | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Myles Timothy Harrison | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marie George | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Ian Koch | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dempster | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gray | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
STUART WARREN FARIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA KATHRYN FAIRHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.27k | £28.64k | £33.74k | £34.16k | £30.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.44k | £17.23k | £43.74k | £31.43k | £29.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.24k | £7.61k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER - 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Woosehill Scouts
Scout Hut
Chestnut Avenue
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG41 3RS
- Phone:
- 01189776772
- Email:
- admin@1stwoosehill.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window