Trustees 1ST WOOSEHILL SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 801523

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jane Hopkins | Chair | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Keith Jordan | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
William John Anthony Queenan | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Lucille Overd | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Myles Timothy Harrison | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marie George | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Ian Koch | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dempster | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gray | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
STUART WARREN FARIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA KATHRYN FAIRHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.