Trustees ESSEX BRIDLEWAYS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 801530

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bradley Meneer | Chair | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Smith | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Deeran | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Power | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA HATCH | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
LISA GUY | Trustee | 08 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENISE DILLON | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|||||
ALISON CRAIGMILE | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET ARTHUR | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE FULLER | Trustee | 05 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.