Accounts and annual returns VICTIMS SUPPORT LONDON - THE LONDON FEDERATION OF VICTIMS SUPPORT SCHEMES
Charity number: 801537
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 31 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 30 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 01 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 08 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 19 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 24 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 01 February 2006 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 10 February 2006 | 10 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 02 April 2005 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 02 April 2005 | 61 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window