ROTARY CLUB OF IPSWICH CHARITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable donations to individuals and bodies to assist their activities or actions. Activity primarily focussed around Ipswich but also make donations to overseas activities e.g. South Africa, India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 April 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CHARLES CLEMENTS | Chair | 08 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Rogers | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Malcolm Girling | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mervyn John Dye | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jeffery | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED HENRY REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.70k | £10.76k | £7.55k | £11.72k | £28.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.74k | £8.07k | £7.52k | £4.32k | £14.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1972
Charitable objects
TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME TO FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE CLUB SHALL PROPERLY DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
144 WESTERFIELD ROAD
IPSWICH
IP4 3AF
- Phone:
- 07722089096
- Email:
- areeves.rotary@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window