Financial history THE FRIENDS OF SWINDON RAILWAY MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity Number: 801555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.05k £8.88k £7.78k £14.37k £12.48k
Total expenditure £5.57k £3.27k £3.58k £6.29k £5.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A