Financial history THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF RELIGIONS (BASR)

Charity number: 801567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/08/2019 15/08/2020 15/08/2021 15/08/2022 15/08/2023
Total gross income £7.09k £4.79k £6.40k £4.76k £9.20k
Total expenditure £5.76k £9.07k £2.47k £2.60k £7.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A