Financial history TAVISTOCK COMMUNITY CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 801576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £34.00k £50.17k £48.06k £54.75k £63.12k
Total expenditure £29.19k £28.44k £22.74k £30.10k £35.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.30k N/A N/A