Trustees WOODINGDEAN SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 801586

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Penton | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susy Rey | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Offen | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Bristow | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carmelle Levitt | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Davy-Green | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte West | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Priest | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Tucknott | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charley Morgan | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Racheal Bryant | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Joyce Nickels | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.