THE PAULA CARR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help people with diabetes in Kent
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 22 May 1989: Standard registration
- PAULA CARR DIABETES TRUST (Working name)
- THE PAULA CARR TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY JOHN FAGG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Joseph Coleman | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Thomas Anderson | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Bond | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROS DEBLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £718.85k | £214.73k | £127.43k | £18.47k | £182.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £459.23k | £757.65k | £189.06k | £463.06k | £129.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £713.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £692.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £459.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH MAY 1989 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 24TH MAY 1990 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF DIABETIC PATIENTS LIVING IN SOUTH EAST KENT AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DESCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
PAULA CARR TRUST
PAULA CARR DIABETES CARE CENTRE
WILLIAM HARVEY HOSPITAL
ASHFORD
KENT
TN24 0LZ
- Phone:
- 01233651844
- Email:
- helen.elford@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window