FULHAM AND HAMMERSMITH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The study and practice and the concert performance of choral works, and the furthering of interest in choral music generally, and in particular: Rehearse and perform choral music works of all kinds Extend the musical knowledge and technique of the choir by instruction and practice Foster and develop friendly relations between choir members Assist other charitable organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 15 May 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Dawn Hill | Chair | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Riah Angharad Knowles-Brock | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ada Willimas | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Marjorie Borthwick | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Coate | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Griselda Kellie-Smith | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Claude Pierron | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rob Quinn | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE QUINN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.39k | £1.08k | £31.75k | £35.58k | £39.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.80k | £3.36k | £28.67k | £34.39k | £38.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 16 JUNE 1986 AND AMENDED 7 DECEMBER 1988, 8 FEBRUARY 1989, 10 JUNE 1992 AND 25 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE AND THE CONCERT PERFORMANCE OF STANDARD CHORAL WORKS, AND THE FURTHERING OF INTEREST IN CHORAL MUSIC GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE FULHAM AND HAMMERSMITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 SEYMOUR AVENUE
EPSOM
KT17 2RR
- Phone:
- 02083933217
- Email:
- fhcschoir@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window