TRETHURGY SOCIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide recreational events for the people of Trethurgy and surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 January 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 06 June 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVERBYN PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/01/2020 | 14/01/2021 | 14/01/2022 | 14/01/2023 | 14/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.42k | £1.50k | £6.23k | £3.59k | £3.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.73k | £2.33k | £9.24k | £4.15k | £4.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 January 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 14TH DECEMBER 1990.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF TRETHURGY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TRETHURGY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AS DEFINED IN DEED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Friary
Trethurgy
St. Austell
PL26 8YF
- Phone:
- 01726852369
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window