198 CONTEMPORARY ARTS AND LEARNING LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
198 Contemporary Arts and Learning is a pre-eminent visual art space in Brixton, which explores the rich diversity of artistic practices informed by globalisation and emerging cultural identities. We foster creative synergies through a challenging artistic and education programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £173,168 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 08 June 1989: Standard registration
- 198 GALLERY LTD (Previous name)
- ROOTS COMMUNITY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linton Johnson | Chair | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kay Scorah | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oneil Williams | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Lockey | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Theophilus | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leslie Johnson | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ajamu IKWE-TYEHIMBA | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Asante | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £872.44k | £814.59k | £483.43k | £346.59k | £383.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £243.26k | £268.15k | £313.37k | £306.93k | £357.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £100.00k | £486.16k | £338.70k | £268.12k | £173.17k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £872.37k | £54.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £759.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £69 | £23 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £227.17k | £268.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £16.09k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14 JULY 1999 AND 17 AUGUST 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/09/2015
Charitable objects
4.1 TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE AN ARTS EXHIBITION CENTRE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH, THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON GENERALLY AND BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL AUDIENCES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE ARTS EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 4.2 TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO THE ARTS AND PARTICULARLY WITH YOUNG PEOPLE 4.3 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
198 CONTEMPORARY ARTS AND LEARNING
194-198 RAILTON ROAD
LONDON
SE24 0JT
- Phone:
- 02079788309
- Email:
- info@198.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window