HUNSDON LOCAL HISTORY AND PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity Number: 801648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of historical knowledge and information, paticularly of a local nature when possible, through meetings, organised trips and research.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £567
Total expenditure: £564

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pauline Fitch Trustee 16 January 2015
None on record
Pamela Slater Trustee 16 January 2015
None on record
Malcolm Slater Trustee 06 January 2015
HUNSDON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
RICHARD WATERS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £504 £405 £91 £147 £567
Total expenditure £448 £301 £202 £578 £564
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 06 September 2024 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 06 October 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 03 October 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 17 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
39 WIDFORD ROAD
HUNSDON
WARE
SG12 8NN
Phone:
01279842581
Website:

No information available