CHAPEL BREAK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community centre providing a space for user groups to run their groups/activities from.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £934 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 17 August 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Harrison | Chair |
|
||||||
Claire Charvill | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Foster | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Cordy | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Kay Kazim | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
KARRIE ANN DALE | Trustee | 12 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY DOY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.38k | £44.92k | £38.52k | £39.77k | £47.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.25k | £45.69k | £37.24k | £39.96k | £44.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.71k | £2.10k | N/A | £934 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 November 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 November 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT PRIMARILY OF THE RESIDENTS OF CHAPEL BREAK AND ALSO OF NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION ON ANY GROUNDS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID RESIDENTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH A VILLAGE HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A VILLAGE HALL FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CHAPEL BREAK AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chapel Break Village Hall
Harpsfield
NORWICH
NR5 9LG
- Phone:
- 01603442059
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window