RENT-A-ROLE DRAMA SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
i. To promote the education of young people under the age of twenty-five through the medium of drama ii. To relieve those persons with special needs through the medium of drama iii. To promote the education of young people in the art and science of theatre and drama iv. To work with disadvantaged individuals and communities using theatre as a tool for social change
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
- Somerset
- Torbay
Governance
- 08 June 1989: Standard registration
- BARBICAN THEATRE (Working name)
- THE BARBICAN THEATRE, PLYMOUTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Leslie Tatam | Chair | 09 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
Amanda Lee | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle James | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Stuart Tulloch Thomas | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gina Small | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £838.58k | £412.96k | £674.98k | £489.52k | £414.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £789.45k | £469.77k | £584.89k | £571.88k | £479.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £34.00k | £333.51k | £27.60k | £25.38k | £20.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.07k | N/A | £22.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £31.80k | N/A | £56.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £802.17k | N/A | £595.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £543 | N/A | £769 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £734.44k | N/A | £529.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £53.78k | N/A | £54.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £1.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.23k | N/A | £1.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 173 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST DECEMBER 1988 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12 FEB 2001, AND 14/03/2005
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY-FIVE THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF DRAMA. (B) TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF DRAMA. (C) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF THE THEATRE AND DRAMA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARBICAN THEATRE
CASTLE STREET
PLYMOUTH
PL1 2NJ
- Phone:
- 01752242014
- Email:
- info@barbicantheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window