Financial history ROMSEY CENTRE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 801708
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £82.49k £85.33k £90.76k £90.84k £111.28k
Total expenditure £66.86k £74.13k £83.83k £85.55k £105.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £73.27k £79.43k N/A £97.28k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A