Trustees THE THOMAS LAYTON COLLECTION
Charity number: 801711
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. JAMES WISDOM | Chair | 20 February 2012 |
|
|||||||
ALEXANDER JAMES MARSHALL | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
COUNCILLOR CORINNA MARGARET MARY SMART | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
COUNCILLOR EDWIN GUY LAMBERT | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|||||||
MEL COLLINS | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||||
HOWARD SIMMONS | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
JON COTTON | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
SAM HEARN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JANET MCNAMARA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.