THE KATHLEEN AND SIDNEY LINKINS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives financial help to people over 60 years and in need of care and attention and comfort and unable through straightened circumstances to make provision for themselves. Gives to other charities for the benefit of such people. Restricted area south of South Downs centred on Chichester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 June 1990: Standard registration
- KATHLEEN AND SYDNEY LINKINS MEMORIAL TRUST (Previous name)
- THE KATHLEEN AND SYDNEY LINKINS MEMORIAL TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simonne Fellowes | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN HAMMOND | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|||||
MR Howard Bottomley | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.39k | £26.82k | £28.62k | £32.18k | £33.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.30k | £14.97k | £14.72k | £22.02k | £23.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT WINCHESTER 28TH MAY 1988 VARIED BY SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 2ND MAY 1990. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF ANY PERSONS WITHIN THE CITY OF CHICHESTER AND THE ADJOINING PARISHES OF APPLEDRAM DONNINGTON AND LAVANT AND THE AREA KNOWN AS FISHBOURNE WITHIN THE PARISH OF BOSHAM WHO ARE OVER THE AGE OF 60 YEARS AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE, ATTENTION AND COMFORT AND UNABLE THROUGH STRAITENED CIRCUMSTANCES TO MAKE PROVISION FOR THEMSELVES.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARLEY
FORDWATER ROAD
CHICHESTER
WEST SUSSEX
PO19 6PR
- Phone:
- 01243528603
- Email:
- k.osterploh@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window