Financial history THE ELLESMERE CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 801728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £96.52k £89.26k £109.49k £104.38k £113.11k
Total expenditure £103.06k £103.90k £116.75k £117.39k £124.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £58.56k N/A £8.61k £5.78k