CREATION SCIENCE MOVEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Creation Science Movement exists to promote the biblical doctrine of Creation and to discuss the ethical and scientific implications of the scriptural account of Creation. We do this via mailings of a journal and pamphlets, by lectures and debates in churches, colleges and in public broadcasts, and through DVDs, CDs and books. We run a permanent exhibition on The Hard, Portsmouth PO1 3DT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 June 1989: Standard registration
- C S M (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Edward Broadberry | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Wainwright | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Shires BSc | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.52k | £81.32k | £89.59k | £62.80k | £168.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.31k | £67.15k | £108.83k | £277.37k | £263.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 July 2022 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 July 2022 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 August 2020 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 August 2020 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH FEBRUARY 1989 SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AS REVEALED IN HOLY SCRIPTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Creation Science Movement
5 Brayford Square
LONDON
E1 0SG
- Phone:
- 0123456789
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window