Financial history BILL BROWN'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT OF 1989

Charity number: 801756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £625.21k £495.43k £591.37k £464.86k £533.15k
Total expenditure £4.00m £1.26m £409.94k £472.22k £586.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £625.21k N/A £591.37k N/A £533.15k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.74m N/A £164.05k N/A £237.84k
Expenditure - Raising funds £256.27k N/A £245.89k N/A £348.38k
Expenditure - Governance £11.89k N/A £58.15k N/A £71.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.67m N/A £105.90k N/A £166.25k
Expenditure - Investment management £256.27k N/A £245.89k N/A £348.38k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0