Financial history SAFFRON WALDEN COMMUNITY YOUTH SPORTS CLUB

Charity number: 801764
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £112.11k £307.08k £167.90k £156.67k £241.75k
Total expenditure £86.13k £205.11k £168.93k £255.43k £249.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £150.00k N/A N/A N/A