CHRISTIAN VOCATIONS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Vocations exists to help encourage individuals explore and use their God-given gifts in life and service. This is done through (i) providing quality resources, information and vocational advice especially in relation to Christian charity work in the UK and worldwide, and (ii) working with Christian charities and churches in personnel recruitment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 July 1989: Standard registration
- 02 March 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 02 March 2011: Funds transferred to 1081966 EVANGELICAL MISSION ASSOCIATION
- CHRISTIAN VOCATIONS (Working name)
- THE CHRISTIAN SERVICE CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.07k | £181.33k | £159.60k | £157.69k | £145.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.91k | £184.82k | £177.54k | £168.55k | £164.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 26 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 07 May 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 25 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 29 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 21 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 16 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 02 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 05 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 11 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 11 July 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 1989 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window