MISSION IN LONDON'S ECONOMY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 June 1989: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SOUTH LONDON INDUSTRIAL MISSION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.02k | £28.77k | £4.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.07k | £43.46k | £4.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 FEBRUARY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 OCTOBER 2007 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST THE CHURCH IN GREATER LONDON IN BRINGING CLOSER TOGETHER THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORKDAY WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR: A) TO ADVISE ON WAYS AND MEANS OF THE CHURCH FULFILLING A MINISTRY TOWARDS THE INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL AND URBAN COMMUNITY; B) TO ENCOURAGE AND EXTEND THE WORK OF THE INDUSTRIAL CHAPLAINS; C) TO FORWARD THE TRAINING OF CHRISTIAN LEADERSHIP AND THE CREATION OF INFORMAL PUBLIC OPINION ON THE RELATIONS BETWEEN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL AND ECONOMIC LIFE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window