Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN LEWIS TRUST

Charity number: 801856
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2006 22 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 27 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 20 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 28 February 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 01 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 01 March 2005 On Time