CHRISTIAN LEWIS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 August 1989: Standard registration
- 16 May 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 16 May 2007: Funds transferred to 1113821 KIDS CANCER CHARITY
- CHRISTIAN LEWIS CHILDREN'S CANCER CARE (Working name)
- CHRISTIAN LEWIS TRUST CHILDRENS CANCER CHARITY (Working name)
- CHRISTIAN LEWIS TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £600.62k | £714.79k | £574.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £539.17k | £576.12k | £568.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 22 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 27 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 20 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 28 February 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 01 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 01 March 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 MAY 1989
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG SUFFERERS OF NEUROBLASTOMA AND RELATED CHILDHOOD CANCERS BY UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO SUCH DISEASES AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF AND BY THE COMFORTING AND SCREENING OF SUFFERERS OR SUSPECTED SUFFERERS AS THE CASE MAY BE ANYWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF THE SAID DISEASE NEUROBLASTOMA OR OF ANY CHILD-RELATED CANCERS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window