Accounts and annual returns MECHANICAL MUSIC MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 801863
Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 04 December 2024 614 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 12 August 2024 865 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 12 August 2024 865 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 April 2021 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required