Governing document PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION, HOUNSLOW, MIDDLESEX
Charity Number: 801883

Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/01/1973 AS AMENDED ON 17/12/1988 AS AMENDED ON 22/02/1992 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 05/02/1994 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 23/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW AND ITS ADJACENT BOROUGHS, PARTICULARLY THOSE OF PAKISTANI ORIGIN OR DESCENT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HOUNSLOW LB AND ADJACANT BOROUGHS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.