THE BRIDGE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects (the Objects) are: To advance the education of the students of The Bridge London Trust by providing and assisting in the provision of resources and equipment not funded by DFE/ESFA or Local Authority grants. To promote activities which support The Trust in offering a broad and balanced curriculum and care for pupils of different abilities between the ages of 5 and 19.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 September 1989: Standard registration
- ROSEMARY PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION (ALSO KNOWN AS ROSEMARY SCHOOL PARENT/STAFF ASSOCIATION) (Previous name)
- THE BRIDGE SCHOOL (ISLINGTON) PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Morrissey | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Harold Reid | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PENNY BARRATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.90k | £46.48k | £36.54k | £37.78k | £171.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.59k | £1.66k | £42.49k | £113.57k | £10.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/04/1989 AS AMENDED ON 11/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 26/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2013
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE BRIDGE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION FOR FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) B. FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL C. ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE BRIDGE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
THE BRIDGE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Bridge MAT
251 Hungerford Road
LONDON
N7 9LD
- Phone:
- 020 769 1000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window