THE ANN DRIVER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ann Driver Trust was founded in June 1989, in memory of Ann Driver MBE, musician and broadcaster. It supports the education of youth in the arts, with special emphasis on music, by giving grants to nominated schools and colleges.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 August 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT PRITCHETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Daisy Vatalaro | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Rahman | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN DUNCAN | Trustee | 25 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALASDAIR WILSON ROBERTSON TAIT | Trustee |
|
||||||
TIMOTHY GREY WAKELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.88k | £35.00k | £31.80k | £28.41k | £29.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.38k | £36.94k | £41.56k | £41.28k | £43.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH JUNE 1989 as amended on 03 Feb 2022 as amended on 24 Jan 2023 as amended on 24 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUTH IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF MUSICIANS
26 Fitzroy Square
LONDON
W1T 6BT
- Phone:
- 07957 203241
- Email:
- secretary@anndrivertrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window