SOUTH WILLESBOROUGH AND NEWTOWN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The establishment of a community centre and to maintain and manage the same for the benefit of the inhabitants of South Willesborough & Newtown.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £224 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 27 July 1989: Standard registration
- S W A N C C (Working name)
- SWAH CENTRE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- SWAN COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR S HEATHFIELD | Chair | 21 April 1991 |
|
|
||||
David Rains | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
MR C MASTERS | Trustee | 21 April 1991 |
|
|
||||
MR J DOWN | Trustee | 21 April 1991 |
|
|
||||
MRS M ADDINGTON | Trustee | 28 February 1989 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROBIN WORSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DAVE GOWER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.88k | £21.64k | £16.48k | £13.13k | £14.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.16k | £8.37k | £10.40k | £19.56k | £21.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.10k | £10.10k | N/A | £224 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH JANUARY 1989, AMENDED 6TH JUNE 1991 AND AS AMENDED 27TH APRIL 1997.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEW TOWN AND SOUTH WILLESBOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS;(B)TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY)IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NEW TOWN AND SOUTH WILLESBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 EARLSWORTH ROAD
WILLESBOROUGH
ASHFORD
TN24 0DN
- Phone:
- 01233646063
- Email:
- swancentre89@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window