THE RICK KEELING MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides annual awards to be awarded to one or more students at Thurston Community College in recognition of outstanding merit beyond the academic curriculum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 August 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD SPERRIN FAWCETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Paul Roy Potter | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David John Ford | Trustee |
|
||||||||
STEWART CHENERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
IAN RICHARD TOULSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JEAN ALEXIS WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £980 | £1.21k | £851 | £1.03k | £928 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £3.05k | £0 | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JULY 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ANNUAL AWARDS TO BE AWARDED TO ONE OR MORE PUPILS OF THURSTON UPPER SCHOOL IN RECOGNITION OF OUTSTANDING MERIT BEYOND THE ACADEMIC CURRICULUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glenrose
Gedding Road
Drinkstone
Drinkstone Green
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP30 9TD
- Phone:
- 01449737829
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window